NJ A3692 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands notification when an offender is released from custody or transferred within the criminal justice system. *
Title
Expands notification when an offender is released from custody or transferred within the criminal justice system. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2513 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2513 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.270. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2513/2522 (SCS/1R) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-0) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan) |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2522 (Same As) 2013-02-21 - Combined with S2513 (SCS)
S2513 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3692 (3R)
S2513 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3692 (3R)