NJ A3661 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1446
Note: Carry Foward to future A2785
Note: Carry Over of previous A5569
Note: Carry Over of previous S3729
Note: Carry Foward to future A2785
Note: Carry Over of previous A5569
Note: Carry Over of previous S3729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey American Dream Act"; appropriates $25 million to provide down payment and home repair assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Title
"New Jersey American Dream Act"; appropriates $25 million to provide down payment and home repair assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S242 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5569 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3729 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S242 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5569 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3729 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3661 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3661_I1.HTM |