NJ A3647 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Cryan)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Cryan)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owners of certain newly developed shopping centers to provide electric vehicle charging stations.
Title
Requires owners of certain newly developed shopping centers to provide electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Cryan) | |
2011-02-03 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2784 (Same As) 2011-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3647 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3647_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3647_R1.HTM |