NJ A3504 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Approved P.L.2015, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Approved P.L.2015, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to use and update NJ Elder Index and related data to the extent possible.*
Title
Requires DHS to use and update NJ Elder Index and related data to the extent possible.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2231 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2231 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2231 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.53. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2231 (1R) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2231 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3504 (1R)