NJ S2231 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3504 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3504 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to use and update NJ Elder Index and related data to the extent possible.*
Title
Requires DHS to use and update NJ Elder Index and related data to the extent possible.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted by A3504 (1R) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3504 (Same As) 2015-05-07 - Approved P.L.2015, c.53.