NJ A3485 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1992
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the gross income tax rate on taxable income exceeding $1,000,000 to 10.75 percent for a temporary three-year-period and restores the State earned income tax credit to 25 percent of the federal credit.
Title
Raises the gross income tax rate on taxable income exceeding $1,000,000 to 10.75 percent for a temporary three-year-period and restores the State earned income tax credit to 25 percent of the federal credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2263 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2263 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2263 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-16) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2263 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-31-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3485 (Carry Over) 2014-07-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2263 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A3485
S2263 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A3485