NJ A344 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2943
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.460.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.460.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.
Title
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1575 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.460. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-1) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S1575 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-17-0) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
S1575 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A344
S1575 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A344
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A344 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/344_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A344 |