NJ A2943 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A344
Note: Carry Foward to future S1575
Note: Carry Over of previous A2598
Note: Carry Foward to future S1575
Note: Carry Over of previous A2598
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.
Title
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
A2943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
A2598 (Carry Over) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S729 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
A2598 (Carry Over) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S729 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee