NJ A3410 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals family cap in Work First New Jersey program.
Title
Repeals family cap in Work First New Jersey program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1854 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-14) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S1854 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-25-1) |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1854 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A3410
A33 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A33 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly