NJ A3405 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Approved P.L.2013, c.157.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Approved P.L.2013, c.157.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for temporary approval of WIC vendor applications if the applicant currently operates another approved program.
Title
Provides for temporary approval of WIC vendor applications if the applicant currently operates another approved program.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2484 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2484 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.157. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2484 |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2484 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by A3405