NJ A3387 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3161
Note: Carry Foward to future S2410
Note: Carry Over of previous A2926
Note: Carry Over of previous S2483
Note: Carry Foward to future S2410
Note: Carry Over of previous A2926
Note: Carry Over of previous S2483
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Transit Villages Act."
Title
"New Jersey Transit Villages Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3387 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A3387 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1639 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2926 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2483 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3387 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1639 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2926 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2483 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3387 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3387_I1.HTM |