NJ A3278 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2516 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2516 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases civil and criminal penalties involving unstamped and counterfeit cigarettes and cigarette smuggling and establishes crime involving transfers of counterfeit cigarettes.*
Title
Increases civil and criminal penalties involving unstamped and counterfeit cigarettes and cigarette smuggling and establishes crime involving transfers of counterfeit cigarettes.*
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Sen. Peter Barnes [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2516 (2R) |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-09-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2516 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.145.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3278 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3278_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3278_R1.HTM |