NJ A3252 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2496
Note: Carry Foward to future S1844
Note: Carry Over of previous A3852
Note: Carry Over of previous S1174
Note: Carry Foward to future S1844
Note: Carry Over of previous A3852
Note: Carry Over of previous S1174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Megan's law to requirements of federal Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act.
Title
Conforms Megan's law to requirements of federal Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3252 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3252 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3852 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2111 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1174 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3252 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3852 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2111 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1174 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3252 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3252_I1.HTM |