NJ A2496 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3758
Note: Carry Over of previous A3252
Note: Carry Over of previous S2111
Note: Carry Over of previous A2349
Note: Carry Over of previous S774
Note: Carry Over of previous A3252
Note: Carry Over of previous S2111
Note: Carry Over of previous A2349
Note: Carry Over of previous S774
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Megan's law to requirements of federal Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act.
Title
Conforms Megan's law to requirements of federal Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2496 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3252 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2111 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1844 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2349 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Combined with A998 (ACS)
S774 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3252 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2111 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1844 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2349 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Combined with A998 (ACS)
S774 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2496 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2500/2496_I1.HTM |