NJ A3199 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against living organ donors in relation to life, health, and long-term care insurance.
Title
Prohibits discrimination against living organ donors in relation to life, health, and long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.72. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2315 (2R) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Beach) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2315 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A3199 (3R)