NJ A3190 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6049
Note: Carry Over of previous S4247
Note: Carry Over of previous S4247
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes criteria for distribution of Fiscal Year 2020 funding to Community Food Bank of New Jersey and partner organization.
Title
Establishes criteria for distribution of Fiscal Year 2020 funding to Community Food Bank of New Jersey and partner organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S760 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A6049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
S4247 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.446.
A6049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
S4247 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.446.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3190 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3190_I1.HTM |