NJ A6049 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3190
Note: Carry Foward to future S760
Note: Carry Foward to future S760
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes criteria for distribution of Fiscal Year 2020 funding to Community Food Bank of New Jersey and partner organizations.
Title
Establishes criteria for distribution of Fiscal Year 2020 funding to Community Food Bank of New Jersey and partner organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S4247 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
A6049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
S4247 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.446.
A6049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4247 (1R)
S4247 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.446.