NJ A317 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1964
Note: Carry Foward to future S384
Note: Carry Over of previous A553
Note: Carry Foward to future S384
Note: Carry Over of previous A553
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain requirements for domestic violence training for certain judges and judicial personnel.
Title
Establishes certain requirements for domestic violence training for certain judges and judicial personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A317 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A317 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A553 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S115 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A317 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A553 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S115 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A317 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/317_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A317 |