NJ A1964 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A317
Note: Carry Over of previous S115
Note: Carry Over of previous S115
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S384 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S384 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands training for judges, law enforcement officers and assistant county prosecutors concerning handling of domestic violence cases.
Title
Expands training for judges, law enforcement officers and assistant county prosecutors concerning handling of domestic violence cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S384 (2R) |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A317 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S384 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.377.
S115 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S384 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.377.
S115 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee