NJ A3161 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Approved P.L.2015, c.50.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Implements current car seat safety recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implements current car seat safety recommendations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2026 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2026 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenateApproved P.L.2015, c.50.
2015-03-16SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2015-03-16SenateSubstituted for S2026 (1R)
2014-09-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-06-23SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2014-06-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2014-06-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)
2014-06-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-05-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2026 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3161 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback