NJ A3142 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3354
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain licensure requirements to operate water supply and wastewater treatment systems.
Title
Revises certain licensure requirements to operate water supply and wastewater treatment systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3354 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2672 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2672 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee