NJ A3118 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3629
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes licensure for master hearth specialists.*
Title
Establishes licensure for master hearth specialists.*
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1303 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.260. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S1303 (SS) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-4-1) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1303 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A3118 (ACS)
S3629 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3629 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee