NJ A311 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3146
Note: Carryover of previous A3146

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S439 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2018-01-05SenateSubstituted for S439 (1R)
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2016-04-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2016-02-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3146 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S439 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A311
A3146 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback