NJ A3146 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A311
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.
Title
Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3146 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2188 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2188 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee