NJ A3245 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A311

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S52 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted by S52 (1R)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S52 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.95.
A311 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback