NJ A3067 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.253.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.253.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns various authorities, boards, commissions, councils, divisions, and task forces.
Title
Concerns various authorities, boards, commissions, councils, divisions, and task forces.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Peter Barnes [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2603 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2603 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.253. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-1-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2603 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Whelan) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-6-3) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Singleton) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Singleton) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2603 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3067 (3R)