NJ A3060 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4980
Note: Carry Over of previous S3398
Note: Carry Over of previous S3398
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (71-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (71-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits designation of special event zones for traffic regulation purposes during certain large events.
Title
Permits designation of special event zones for traffic regulation purposes during certain large events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-1-0) |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4980 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3398 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1362 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3398 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1362 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee