NJ A3047 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4368
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates viticulture trail tourist directional signs.
Title
Creates viticulture trail tourist directional signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2127 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S2127 |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4368 (Carry Over) 2015-03-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2127 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A3047
S2127 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A3047