NJ A303 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A955
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Mortgage Assistance Pilot Program."
Title
Establishes the "Mortgage Assistance Pilot Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A955 (Carry Over) 2014-10-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1629 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1629 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A303 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/303_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A303 |