NJ A2998 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A1496

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-20 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Permits court to order counseling for children in households with domestic violence in appropriate cases; establishes presumption of award of custody to domestic violence victim in appropriate cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits court to order counseling for children in households with domestic violence in appropriate cases; establishes presumption of award of custody to domestic violence victim in appropriate cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-23 - Assembly - Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-20AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2024-09-23AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2024-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1496 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1774 (Same As) 2024-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback