NJ A2996 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4171
Note: Carry Over of previous S2582
Note: Carry Over of previous S2582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cost of living increase to be granted in each of two State fiscal years when retirement allowance or benefit is below certain amount for retiree or beneficiary in PERS, TPAF, PFRS, SPRS, and JRS; makes appropriation.
Title
Requires cost of living increase to be granted in each of two State fiscal years when retirement allowance or benefit is below certain amount for retiree or beneficiary in PERS, TPAF, PFRS, SPRS, and JRS; makes appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4171 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2582 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2475 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2582 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2475 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2996 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3000/2996_I1.HTM |