NJ A2987 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5076
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1799 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1799 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases membership of fire safety commission in DCA.
Title
Increases membership of fire safety commission in DCA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S1799 (1R) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1799 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.176.
A5076 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3458
A5076 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3458