NJ A2949 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3932
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Approved P.L.2016, c.17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Approved P.L.2016, c.17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides diamondback terrapins protection as nongame indigenous species.
Title
Provides diamondback terrapins protection as nongame indigenous species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1625 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.17. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Substituted for S1625 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1625 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - Substituted by A2949
A3932 (Carry Over) 2014-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3932 (Carry Over) 2014-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee