NJ S1625 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Substituted by A2949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Substituted by A2949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides diamondback terrapins protection as nongame indigenous species.
Title
Provides diamondback terrapins protection as nongame indigenous species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Substituted by A2949 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2949 (Same As) 2016-07-15 - Approved P.L.2016, c.17.
A3932 (Carry Over) 2014-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3932 (Carry Over) 2014-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee