NJ A2948 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Approved P.L.2013, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Approved P.L.2013, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth certain reporting requirements when out-of-State law enforcement entities conduct counter-terrorism investigations within New Jersey.*
Title
Sets forth certain reporting requirements when out-of-State law enforcement entities conduct counter-terrorism investigations within New Jersey.*
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2311 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2311 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.156. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2311 (1R) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-3-0) |
2012-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2311 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by A2948 (1R)