NJ A2879 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.75.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.75.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits requirement to disclose user name, password, or other means for accessing account or service through electronic communications devices by institutions of higher education.
Title
Prohibits requirement to disclose user name, password, or other means for accessing account or service through electronic communications devices by institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1916 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1916 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, c.75. |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1916 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-2) |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1916 (Same As) 2012-10-25 - Substituted by A2879