NJ A2864 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2187
Note: Carry Over of previous A3675
Note: Carry Over of previous S3574
Note: Carry Over of previous A3675
Note: Carry Over of previous S3574
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Office of Health Transformation to coordinate certain strategic planning for State health care programs.
Title
Establishes Office of Health Transformation to coordinate certain strategic planning for State health care programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1043 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2187 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3675 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3574 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2187 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3675 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3574 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2864 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2864_I1.HTM |