CO HB1132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning comprehensive support for organ donation by living organ donors.
Title
Support for Living Organ Donors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1132, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment K). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1132, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1132, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment K). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1132, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1132, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Fiscal Policy & Taxes
Health Care & Health Insurance
Labor & Employment
Public Health
Transportation & Motor Vehicles
Health Care & Health Insurance
Labor & Employment
Public Health
Transportation & Motor Vehicles