CO HB1231 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state funding for four projects related to health sciences education programs for medical professions being undertaken by state institutions of higher education, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the state to issue financed purchase of an asset or certificate of participation agreements to finance a portion of capital costs associated with construction of facilities for the university of northern Colorado's college of osteopathic medicine, metropolitan state university of Denver's health institute tower, Colorado state university's veterinary health education campus, and expansion and renovation of Trinidad state college's valley campus main building, providing funding for escrow money that is required for accreditation of the university of northern Colorado's college of osteopathic medicine by transferring money from the general fund for ultimate deposit to an escrow account and reducing the state reserve by the same amount for the period during which the money is held in escrow, and making an appropriation.
Title
State Funding for Higher Education Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1231 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1231, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1231, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1231 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1231, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1231, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services + Finance |