NJ A2859 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Approved P.L.2011, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Approved P.L.2011, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes sale and lease of unneeded public property to certain nonprofits for gardening and urban farming and exempts such urban farms from property taxation.
Title
Authorizes sale and lease of unneeded public property to certain nonprofits for gardening and urban farming and exempts such urban farms from property taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Approved P.L.2011, c.35. | |
2011-01-10 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-2) | |
2011-01-10 | Substituted for S1964 (2R) | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Assembly (61-15-2) | |
2011-01-06 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Quijano) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-09-13 | Transferred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1964 (Same As) 2011-01-10 - Substituted by A2859 (2R)