NJ A2804 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4620
Note: Carry Over of previous S3590
Note: Carry Over of previous S3590
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides DHS and State Board of Medical Examiners to develop and implement process to improve efficiency of reviewing NJ FamilyCare provider applications.
Title
Provides DHS and State Board of Medical Examiners to develop and implement process to improve efficiency of reviewing NJ FamilyCare provider applications.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4620 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3590 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3590 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee