NJ A2761 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3327
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Approved P.L.2018, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Approved P.L.2018, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds.*
Title
Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S102 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S102 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.39. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-20-1) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-13) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Substituted for S102 (2R) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-25-3) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Pintor Marin) (49-26-0) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Rooney) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S102 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A2761 (3R)
A3327 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3327 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee