NJ S102 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S818
Note: Carryover of previous S818

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A2761 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateSubstituted by A2761 (3R)
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-16SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-04-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S818 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S818 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2761 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - Approved P.L.2018, c.39.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback