NJ A2732 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A773
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that use of propane-powered noise making device is allowed as non-lethal method of wildlife control on farmland.
Title
Clarifies that use of propane-powered noise making device is allowed as non-lethal method of wildlife control on farmland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1391 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.19. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-1) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S1391 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-2) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1391 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2732
A773 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A773 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading