NJ A2676 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3056
Note: Carry Foward to future S1342
Note: Carry Over of previous S4096
Note: Carry Foward to future S1342
Note: Carry Over of previous S4096
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises permitting thresholds for certain types of development requiring CAFRA permit from DEP.
Title
Revises permitting thresholds for certain types of development requiring CAFRA permit from DEP.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1212 |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2676 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A2676 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1212 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
A2676 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1212 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)