NJ S4096 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1212
Note: Carry Foward to future A2676
Note: Carry Foward to future A2676
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises permitting thresholds for certain types of development requiring CAFRA permit from DEP.
Title
Revises permitting thresholds for certain types of development requiring CAFRA permit from DEP.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S4096 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4500/4096_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S4096 |