NJ A2676 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route 7 bridge between Township of Belleville and Borough of North Arlington "Lance Corporal Osbrany Montes De Oca Memorial Bridge." *
Title
Designates State Highway Route 7 bridge between Township of Belleville and Borough of North Arlington "Lance Corporal Osbrany Montes De Oca Memorial Bridge." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1823 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1823 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, c.58. |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1823 (1R) |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1823 (Same As) 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A2676 (1R)