NJ A2667 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1182
Note: Carry Over of previous A3568
Note: Carry Over of previous A3568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment of processes to identify Medicaid-eligible incarcerated individuals who are awaiting pre-trial release determinations, are being released following period of incarceration, or are undergoing inpatient hospital treatment.
Title
Requires establishment of processes to identify Medicaid-eligible incarcerated individuals who are awaiting pre-trial release determinations, are being released following period of incarceration, or are undergoing inpatient hospital treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1111 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1182 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3568 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1182 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3568 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2667 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2667_I1.HTM |