NJ S1111 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1198
Note: Carry Over of previous S1182
Note: Carry Over of previous A3568
Note: Carry Over of previous S1182
Note: Carry Over of previous A3568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment of processes to identify Medicaid eligible incarcerated individuals who are awaiting pre-trial release determinations, are being released following period of incarceration, or are undergoing inpatient hospital treatment.
Title
Requires establishment of processes to identify Medicaid eligible incarcerated individuals who are awaiting pre-trial release determinations, are being released following period of incarceration, or are undergoing inpatient hospital treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1111 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1182 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2667 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3568 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1182 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2667 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3568 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1111 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1111_I1.HTM |