NJ A2659 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1086
Note: Carry Over of previous A3042
Note: Carry Over of previous S969
Note: Carry Over of previous A3042
Note: Carry Over of previous S969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires managed care plans, SHBP and SEHBP, to provide for reasonable accommodation in accessing providers for persons with physical disabilities.
Title
Requires managed care plans, SHBP and SEHBP, to provide for reasonable accommodation in accessing providers for persons with physical disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2659 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1132 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3042 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S969 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1132 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3042 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S969 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2659 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2659_I1.HTM |